SETHULE ORPHANS TRUST
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
TO RELIEVE PERSONS PARTICULARLY CHILDREN AND YOUNG PEOPLE, ESPECIALLY ORPHANS WHO ARE IN CONDITIONS OF NEED OR HARDSHIP OR ILLNESS AND TO RELIEVE THE DISTRESS CAUSED THEREBY IN THE MATOPOS AREA OF ZIMBABWE, AND TO ADVANCE EDUCATION FOR CHILDREN IN NEED AND PROMOTE RURAL SELF-HELP PROJECTS
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2020
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Accommodation/housing
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Zimbabwe
Governance
- 22 May 2007: Standard registration
- 10 October 2022: Removed (Amalgamated)
- 10 October 2022: Funds transferred to 1196786 SETHULE ORPHANS' TRUST (UK)
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Paying staff
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2016 | 31/12/2017 | 31/12/2018 | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £141.50k | £203.15k | £158.69k | £234.00k | £37.03k | |
|
Total expenditure | £161.83k | £185.15k | £181.69k | £135.12k | £21.82k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 13 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 13 October 2021 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 31 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 22 October 2020 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 December 2018 | 02 October 2019 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2018 | 02 October 2019 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 22 JUNE 2006
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE PERSONS PARTICULARLY CHILDREN AND YOUNG PEOPLE WHO ARE IN CONDITIONS OF NEED OR HARDSHIP OR ILLNESS AND TO RELIEVE THE DISTRESS CAUSED THEREBY IN SUCH PARTS OF THE WORLD AS THE TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME DECIDE INCLUDING (THOUGH NOT BY WAY OF LIMITATION) ESTABLISHING, OPERATING OR ASSISTING IN THE OPERATION OF ONE OR MORE ORPHANAGES OR SIMILAR ESTABLISHMENTS TO PROVIDE CARE FOR CHILDREN IN NEED. TO ADVANCE EDUCATION FOR CHILDREN IN NEED.
Area of benefit
SUCH PARTS OF THE WORLD
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window