HOOK VILLAGE HALLS CHARITABLE ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The provision of facilities at two community halls, namely Elizabeth Hall and Hook Community Centre. To provide or assist in the provision of facilities in the interest of social welfare for the benefit of the inhabitants of Hook Parish and within its vicinity.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £1,100 from 2 government grant(s)
People

8 Trustee(s)
20 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Hampshire
Governance
- 31 January 2007: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
David Saunderson | Chair | 25 June 2018 |
|
|
||||
Ian Sealey | Trustee | 25 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Molly Greenland Mrs | Trustee | 25 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Louise Coster-Mills | Trustee | 26 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Michael James Ward | Trustee | 23 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Susan Jane Hinton | Trustee | 15 December 2014 |
|
|
||||
Graham Peter Wickenden | Trustee | 17 November 2014 |
|
|
||||
JEFF BURKE | Trustee | 16 June 2014 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £210.45k | £145.43k | £228.52k | £235.08k | £275.86k | |
|
Total expenditure | £204.05k | £139.53k | £170.84k | £183.31k | £204.50k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £83.74k | £23.00k | £1.00k | £1.10k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 30 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 30 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 22 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 22 November 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 15 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 15 November 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 25 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 25 November 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 02 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 02 December 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 5 JANUARY 2007
Charitable objects
(A) TO PROVIDE OR ASSIST IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF THE HOOK PARISH AND WITHIN ITS VICINITY FOR RECREATION OR OTHER LEISURE OCCUPATION OF INDIVIDUALS INCLUDING THOSE WHO HAVE NEED OF SUCH FACILITIES BY REASON OF THEIR YOUTH, AGE INFIRMITY OR DISABILITY, FINANCIAL HARDSHIP OR SOCIAL CIRCUMSTANCES WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE; (B) TO ADVANCE EDUCATION AND THE RELIGIOUS AND INTELLECTUAL DEVELOPMENT OF THE MEMBERS OF THE COMMUNITY; AND (C) SUCH OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES AS THE CHARITY'S OFFICERS IN THEIR DISCRETION SHALL SEE FIT FOR SUCH EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE OBJECTS OR PURPOSES IN ANY PART OF HOOK PARISH
Area of benefit
HOOK PARISH AND WITHIN ITS VICINITY
Contact information
- Address:
-
ELIZABETH HALL
RAVEN ROAD
HOOK
RG27 9HH
- Phone:
- 01256 764000
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window