EMS VALLEY UNIVERSITY OF THE THIRD AGE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Membership has increased during the past year and the number of active groups has also grown. We continue, despite the restrictions of COVID concerns, with our aim of increasing the learning and leisure activities of the retired members of our area and also to offer opportunities for sharing the various skills of our members.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

11 Trustee(s)
60 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Elderly/old People
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Hampshire
- West Sussex
Governance
- 08 January 2007: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Tim Mathews | Chair | 27 May 2021 |
|
|||||
Les Brokenshire | Trustee | 14 February 2025 |
|
|
||||
Andrea Brokenshire | Trustee | 14 February 2025 |
|
|
||||
Margaret Lesley Melhuish | Trustee | 25 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Elizabeth marie Rosoman | Trustee | 25 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Roderick Alan Lipscombe | Trustee | 25 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Hilary Nola Street | Trustee | 26 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Deborah Robinson | Trustee | 26 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Karen Jane Rodger | Trustee | 25 June 2020 |
|
|
||||
Susan Kent | Trustee | 25 June 2020 |
|
|
||||
ANN SIMS | Trustee | 02 August 2013 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/03/2020 | 30/03/2021 | 30/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £24.78k | £10.98k | £17.56k | £25.64k | £34.88k | |
|
Total expenditure | £21.80k | £7.56k | £17.91k | £26.50k | £31.04k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 20 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 20 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 20 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 23 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 March 2022 | 31 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 March 2021 | 16 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 March 2020 | 02 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 16 MAR 2006 AS AMENDED BY SCHEME DATED 12 JUL 2018 as amended on 16 Apr 2024
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION AND, IN PARTICULAR, THE EDUCATION OF OLDER PEOPLE AND THOSE WHO ARE RETIRED FROM FULL TIME WORK, BY ALL MEANS INCLUDING ASSOCIATED ACTIVITIES CONDUCIVE TO LEARNING AND PERSONAL DEVELOPMENT.
Area of benefit
EMSWORTH AND ITS SURROUNDING LOCALITY
Contact information
- Address:
-
16 Chartwell Drive
HAVANT
Hampshire
PO9 2QB
- Phone:
- 07999544841
- Email:
- secretary@emsvalleyu3a.org
- Website:
-
emsvalleyu3a.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window