SOWING SEEDS MINISTRIES

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To promote and provide support and advice to people, in or heading into crime. Focusing on young people, in need. In particular the provision of support in encouraging citizenship and the provision of positive role models. The advancement of community cohesion and development through supporting ex-offenders back into the community.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
Total income includes £5,000 from 1 government grant(s)
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Religious Activities
- Amateur Sport
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 07 March 2007: Standard registration
- 05 January 2024: Funds received from 286488 THE INGLEBY CHARITABLE TRUST
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Sue Irvin | Trustee | 01 October 2015 |
|
|
||||
BARRY JOSEPH IRVIN | Trustee | 01 November 2014 |
|
|
||||
Joseph Christi | Trustee | 03 December 2013 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £190.01k | £236.19k | £254.96k | £160.40k | £186.74k | |
|
Total expenditure | £209.79k | £152.65k | £209.94k | £204.97k | £186.76k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £5.00k | £56.32k | £32.32k | N/A | £5.00k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 31 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 31 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 31 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 31 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 31 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 31 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 20 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 20 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 29 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 29 September 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 27 NOVEMBER 2006 AS AMENDED BY WRITTEN RESOLUTION 6 MAY 2008
Charitable objects
3. THE CHARITY'S OBJECTS ("THE OBJECTS") ARE:- TO PROMOTE AND SUPPORT THE REHABILITATION AND RESETTLEMENT OF, AND ADVANCE THE EDUCATION FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT OF PEOPLE SITUATED IN PRISONS, DETENTION CENTRE AND YOUNG OFFENDERS INSTITUTIONS, CONSISTENT WITH CHRISTIAN VALUES, BY: PROVIDING SUPPORT, ADVICE AND TRAINING TO THOSE PEOPLE AND THEIR FAMILIES; RUNNING OF PROGRAMMES INTENDING OT CHANGE BEHAVIOUR OF THOSE PERSONS; THE PRACTICAL SUPPORT OF THOSE PERSONS; AND THE TRAINING OF VOLUNTEERS TO PROVIDE SUPPORT. TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN FAITH IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE STATEMENT OF BELIEFS APPEARING IN THE SCHEDULE HERETO IN THE NORTH OF ENGLAND AND IN SUCH OTHER PARTS OF THE UNITED KINGDOM OR THE WORLD AS THE TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME THINK FIT AND OTHER SUCH PURPOSES WHICH ARE EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE ACCORDING TO THE LAW OF ENGLAND AND WALES AND ARE CONNECTED WITH THE CHARITABLE WORK OF THE CHARITY; TO PROVIDE OR ASSIST IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION OR OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION OF INDIVIDUALS WHO HAVE NEED OF SUCH FACILITIES BY REASON OT THEIR YOUTH, AGE, INFIRMITY OR DISABILITY, FINANCIAL HARDSHIP OR SOCIAL CIRCUMSTANCES WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE IN THE NORTH OF ENGLAND AND IN SUCH OTHER PARTS OF THE UNITED KINGDOM OR THE WORLD AS THE TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME THINK FIT.
Area of benefit
IN THE NORTH OF ENGLAND, AND OTHER PARTS OF THE UNITED KINGDOM OR THE WORLD.
Contact information
- Address:
-
FIRST FLOOR
18 BISHOPTON LANE
STOCKTON-ON-TEES
CLEVELAND
TS18 2AA
- Phone:
- 01642787836
- Email:
- tash@sowingseeds.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window