THRONE OF GRACE MINISTRIES INTERNATIONAL
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The advancement of Christianity through the preaching of the gospel of Christ, the holding of regular worship services, bible studies and home church meetings. Provides services (eg care/counselling).
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2009
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Throughout England And Wales
- Ghana
Governance
- 16 January 2007: Standard registration
- 20 January 2015: Removed (Ceased to exist)
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2007 | 30/09/2008 | 30/09/2009 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £49 | £797 | £471 | |
|
Total expenditure | £7.44k | £7.44k | £1.34k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2014 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2014 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2013 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2013 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2012 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2012 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2011 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2011 | Not submitted |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 7 SEPTEMBER 2004
Charitable objects
(I) THE ADVANCEMENT OF CHRISTIANITY THROUGH THE PREACHING OF THE GOSPEL OF CHRIST, THE HOLDING OF REGULAR WORSHIP SERVICES, BIBLE STUDIES AND HOME CHURCH MEETINGS (II) THE RELIEF OF FINANCIAL HARDSHIP IN THE COMMUNITY PARTICULARLY THROUGH MEETING THE NEEDS OF THE HOMELESS, THE SICK, THE ELDERLY AND THOSE IN PRISON (III) TO CARRY OUT SUCH LAWFUL THINGS IN FURTHERANCE OF THE CHRISTIAN RELIGION WHICH THE TRUSTEES IN THEIR ABSOLUTE DISCRETION MAY FROM TIME TO TIME DETERMINE
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED IN PRACTICE UNITED KINGDOM AND GHANA
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window