LIVERPOOL HEARTBEAT

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Promote all aspects of health education among young people, especially the issues of healthy lifestyles and anti-drugs education. Promote drug awareness & citizenship to young people, helping them to make the right choices in life.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 26 December 2023
People

5 Trustee(s)
20 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Human Resources
- Knowsley
- Liverpool City
- Sefton
- St Helens
- Wirral
Governance
- 19 July 2007: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Ian Frances | Trustee | 30 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
KENNETH FRETWELL | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
JUNE RITSON | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Robin Baynes | Trustee |
|
||||||
MR W COX | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 26/12/2019 | 26/12/2020 | 26/12/2021 | 26/12/2022 | 26/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £54.87k | £11.73k | £20.67k | £36.95k | £18.23k | |
|
Total expenditure | £57.76k | £15.18k | £22.00k | £33.10k | £21.42k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 26 December 2023 | 19 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 26 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 26 December 2022 | 14 March 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 26 December 2022 | 17 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 26 December 2021 | 17 February 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 26 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 26 December 2020 | 15 February 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 26 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 26 December 2019 | 12 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 26 December 2019 | 12 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 26 JUNE 2007
Charitable objects
TO ACT AS A RESOURCE FOR YOUNG PEOPLE UP TO THE AGE OF 18 LIVING IN THE NORTH WEST BY PROVIDING ADVICE AND ASSISTANCE AND ORGANISING PROGRAMMES OF PHYSICAL, EDUCATIONAL AND OTHER ACTIVITIES AS A MEANS OF:- A) ADVANCING IN LIFE AND HELPING YOUNG PEOPLE BY DEVELOPING THEIR SKILLS, CAPACITIES AND CAPABILITIES TO ENABLE THEM TO PARTICIPATE IN SOCIETY AS INDEPENDENT, MATURE AND RESPONSIBLE INDIVIDUALS B) ADVANCING EDUCATION C) RELIEVING UNEMPLOYMENT D) PROVIDING RECREATIONAL AND LEISURE TIME ACTIVITY IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR PEOPLE LIVING IN THE AREA OF BENEFIT WHO HAVE NEED BY REASON OF THEIR YOUTH, AGE, INFIRMITY OR DISABILITY, POVERTY OR SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC CIRCUMSTANCES WITH A VIEW TO IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE OF SUCH PERSONS.
Area of benefit
NORTH WEST ENGLAND
Contact information
- Address:
-
132 Anfield Road
LIVERPOOL
L4 0TF
- Phone:
- 01519247347
- Email:
- admin@liverpoolheartbeat.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window