Accounts and annual returns MORRIS GIBBY TRUST

Charity number: 1117516
Charity reporting is up to date (40 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 12 March 2025 40 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 12 March 2025 40 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2023 12 March 2025 406 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 12 March 2025 406 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2022 06 March 2023 34 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2021 06 March 2023 399 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 06 March 2023 764 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 06 March 2023 764 days late Download Open in new window