THE BHOPAL MEDICAL APPEAL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To alleviate the suffering of people who have been directly or indirectly affected by chemical disasters; in particular but not limited to those in the city of Bhopal, India, in the aftermath of the Union Carbide disaster of December 3 1984; and other places in the world in such manner as the trustees think fit.*
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

5 Trustee(s)
140 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- India
Governance
- 09 January 2007: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Sumohon Matilal | Trustee | 19 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
Annie Murray | Trustee | 29 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Avaes Mohammed | Trustee | 09 November 2013 |
|
|
||||
PROFESSOR SUBIR SARKAR | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
TIM PATRICK EDWARDS | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £488.89k | £568.36k | £985.97k | £448.37k | £461.20k | |
|
Total expenditure | £741.44k | £411.09k | £422.74k | £428.19k | £421.37k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | N/A | £555.46k | £561.50k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | N/A | £5.52k | £3.23k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | N/A | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Endowments | N/A | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Investment | N/A | £6 | £10 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other | N/A | £7.37k | £421.23k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Legacies | N/A | £87.24k | £33.93k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | N/A | £243.28k | £273.41k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | N/A | £86.68k | £94.30k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | N/A | £6.11k | £11.51k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | N/A | £192.15k | £216.55k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | N/A | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Other | N/A | £81.13k | £55.03k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 30 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 18 December 2024 | 48 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 02 November 2023 | 2 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 02 November 2023 | 2 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 12 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 12 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 04 November 2021 | 4 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 04 November 2021 | 4 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | |||
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 24/05/2006 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 09/02/2013
Charitable objects
TO ALLEVIATE THE SUFFERING OF PEOPLE WHO WERE DIRECTLY OR INDIRECTLY AFFECTED BY CHEMICAL DISASTERS ANYWHERE IN THE WORLD AND IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT LIMITED TO IN THE CITY OF BHOPAL, INDIA, IN THE AFTERMATH OF THE UNION CARBIDE DISASTER OF DECEMBER 3 1984 AND OTHER PLACES IN THE WORLD IN SUCH MANNER AS THE TRUSTEES THINK FIT.
Area of benefit
BHOPAL, INDIA
Contact information
- Address:
-
The Bhopal Medical Appeal
Community Base
113 Queens Road
Brighton
BN1 3XG
- Phone:
- 01273603278
- Email:
- accounts@bhopal.org
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window