Financial history ROSALIND AND MICHAEL ROSENBLATT CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 1117550
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £0 £2.45k £3.20k £3.50k £13.55k
Total expenditure £8.04k £4.89k £2.89k £3.58k £14.17k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A