ROSALIND AND MICHAEL ROSENBLATT CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 1117550
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

To receive capital sums to be donated for charitable purposes

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Total income: £13,550
Total expenditure: £14,170

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
Who the charity helps:
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
Where the charity operates:
  • Liverpool City
  • Manchester City

Governance

Registration history:
  • 10 January 2007: Standard registration
  • 23 September 2009: Removed (Does not operate)
  • 23 October 2009: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Trust
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

3 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
MICHAEL DAVID ROSENBLATT Trustee
THE FOXHILLS CHARITABLE TRUST
Received: On time
JOEL SIMON ROSENBLATT Trustee
THE FOXHILLS CHARITABLE TRUST
Received: On time
ROSALIND ROSENBLATT Trustee
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £0 £2.45k £3.20k £3.50k £13.55k
Total expenditure £8.04k £4.89k £2.89k £3.58k £14.17k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 18 October 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2023 09 November 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2022 27 October 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2021 19 January 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 24 November 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
OLD MEADOW
HAWLEY LANE
HALE BARNS
ALTRINCHAM
WA15 0DY
Phone:
07768336611
Email:
No information available
Website:

No information available