HALESOWEN CHURCH OF ENGLAND VOLUNTARY AIDED SCHOOL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The income received relates specifically to the letting of the School House.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2014
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Birmingham City
- Coventry City
- Dudley
- Sandwell
- Solihull
- Walsall
- Wolverhampton
Governance
- 13 September 2007: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
HEATHER JANE WEETMAN | Trustee | 20 November 2014 |
|
|
||||
Susan Jane Harding | Trustee | 07 October 2013 |
|
|
||||
Rev Dominic Melville | Trustee | 05 November 2011 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2010 | 31/12/2011 | 31/12/2012 | 31/12/2013 | 31/12/2014 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £6.00k | £0 | £9.60k | £4.03k | £6.40k | |
|
Total expenditure | £6 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 203 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 203 days | |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 569 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 569 days | |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 934 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 934 days | |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1299 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1299 days | |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1664 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1664 days |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DEED DATED 6 NOVEMBER 1838. AS AMENDED 5 SEPTEMBER 1845, 4 MARCH 1859, 14 JUNE 1859 AND 9 OCTOBER 1885
Charitable objects
FOR THE PURPOSE OF ERECTING THEREON A SCHOOL ROOM OR SCHOOL ROOMS TO BE USED FOR THE EDUCATION OF POOR CHILDREN IN THE PRINCIPLES OF THE CHRISTIAN RELIGION ACCORDING TO THE DOCTRINES AND DISCIPLINE OF THE UNITED CHURCH OF ENGLAND AND IRELAND
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED. IN PRACTICE, WEST MIDLANDS
Contact information
- Address:
-
37 LINNET CLOSE
HALESOWEN
B62 8TW
- Phone:
- 01215591614
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window