FOCUS BANBURY COUNSELLING SERVICE
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provision of affordable counselling to the people of Banbury and surrounding areas.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2011
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Northamptonshire
- Oxfordshire
- Warwickshire
Governance
- 28 June 2007: Standard registration
- 25 April 2013: Removed (Ceased to exist)
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2008 | 31/12/2009 | 31/12/2010 | 31/12/2011 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £4.15k | £8.78k | £10.11k | £11.04k | |
|
Total expenditure | £4.46k | £8.66k | £9.46k | £7.12k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2012 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2012 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2011 | 24 April 2012 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2011 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2010 | 31 May 2011 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2010 | 12 April 2011 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 December 2009 | 16 April 2010 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2009 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 7 NOVEMBER 2006
Charitable objects
1 TO PROMOTE HEALTH AND WELLBEING BY PROVIDING A COUNSELLING SERVICE TO ANYONE EXPERIENCING RELATIONAL DIFFICULTIES, DISTRESS OR FINANCIAL HARDSHIP IN BANBURY AND THE SURROUNDING AREAS OF OXFORDSHIRE, WARWICKSHIRE AND NORTHAMPTONSHIRE 2 TO PROMOTE AND PROVIDE EDUCATION AND TRAINING TO THE LOCAL COMMUNITY TO FURTHER THE KNOWLEDGE AND UNDERSTANDING OF COUNSELLING AND ITS BENEFITS TO HEALTH AND WELLBEING.
Area of benefit
OXFORDSHIRE, WARWICKSHIRE, NORTHAMPTONSHIRE
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window