Accounts and annual returns SANTON BRIDGE INSTITUTE

Charity number: 1117609
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 21 April 2024 05 August 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 21 April 2024 Not Required
Annual return 21 April 2023 01 February 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 21 April 2023 Not Required
Annual return 21 April 2022 19 January 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 21 April 2022 Not Required
Annual return 21 April 2021 07 January 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 21 April 2021 Not Required
Annual return 21 April 2020 03 February 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 21 April 2020 Not Required