Accounts and annual returns THE KANGA PROJECT

Charity number: 1119375
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 May 2015 27 February 2016 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2015 Not Required
Annual return 31 May 2014 26 April 2015 26 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2014 Not Required
Annual return 31 May 2013 12 January 2014 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2013 Not Required
Annual return 31 May 2012 28 March 2013 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2012 Not Required