Financial history THE KANGA PROJECT

Charity number: 1119375
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/05/2011 31/05/2012 31/05/2013 31/05/2014 31/05/2015
Total gross income £18.31k £11.93k £8.30k £22.13k £1.79k
Total expenditure £11.23k £17.61k £12.13k £17.24k £3.58k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A