FRIENDSHIP SOCIETY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
FRIENDSHIP SOCIETY IS INVOLVED IN VARIOUS CHARITABLE ACTIVITIES INCLUDING ADVANCE OF THE EDUCATION BY PROVIDING THE PROVISION OF EDUCATION (NOT REQUIRED TO BE PROVIDED BY EDUCATIONAL ATHORITY) , PROVISION OF SPORT ACTIVITIES, THE PROMOTION OF COMMUNITY PARTICIPATION IN HEALTHY RECREATION IN PARTICULAR BY THE PROVISION FOR RHYTHMIC GYMNASTIC. ASSISTANCE TO UKRAINIAN REFUGEES.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2023
Total income includes £13,789 from 2 government grant(s)
People

4 Trustee(s)
46 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Kent
- Throughout London
Governance
- 08 October 2007: Standard registration
- SOUTH EAST RUSSIAN LANGUAGE SOCIETY FRIENDSHIP (Previous name)
- Ofsted (Office For Standards In Education)
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MARIYA TARABASA | Chair | 01 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
GALINA CLARK | Trustee | 01 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
ALINA SALES | Trustee | 01 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
TANYA BEVAN | Trustee | 01 September 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2019 | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £251.71k | £260.25k | £177.56k | £235.64k | £258.45k | |
|
Total expenditure | £254.44k | £258.57k | £168.19k | £239.12k | £267.05k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | £20.99k | £8.58k | £13.79k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 91 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 91 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 17 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 17 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 25 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 25 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 23 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 23 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 21 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 21 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 11 SEPTEMBER 2006 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 20 MAY 2010
Charitable objects
3. OBJECTS THE OBJECTS FOR WHICH THE COMPANY IS FORMED SHALL BE TO: 3.1 ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF ALL AGES AND ABILITIES OF THE PUBLIC IN THE LANGUAGE LITERATURE, HISTORY AND CULTURE OF RUSSIA, PRIMARY EDUCATION AND GENERAL SECONDARY EDUCATION. 3.32 RELIEVE POVERTY, IN PARTICULAR FOR RUSSIAN SPEAKING COMMUNITY BY THE PROVISION OR ASSISTING IN THE PROVISION OF INFORMATION, ADVICE, ASSISTANCE, COUNSELLING, TRANSLATION AND INTERPRETATION SERVICES IN MATTERS WHICH MAY INCLUDE ASYLUM, IMMIGRATION, DEBTS, WELFARE, HEALTH, EDUCATION, TRAINING AND EMPLOYMENT. 3.3 RELIEVE ISOLATION AND IMPROVE THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE OF THE RUSSIAN SPEAKING COMMUNITY IN THE SOUTH EAST THROUGH THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR RECREATION AND OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION IN THE INTEREST OF SOCIAL WELFARE.
Area of benefit
GREATER LONDON AND KENT
Contact information
- Address:
-
105 WEST STREET
ERITH
KENT
DA8 1AG
- Phone:
- 01322330090
- Email:
- friendship@btinternet.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window