Financial history THE LOPPYLUGS AND BARBARA MORRISON CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 1118962
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/04/2020 30/04/2021 30/04/2022 30/04/2023 30/04/2024
Total gross income £233.97k £205.18k £226.18k £303.65k £301.51k
Total expenditure £267.08k £194.80k £234.19k £276.16k £324.87k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A