AUGHTON AINSWORTH INTERNATIONAL FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Charity has leased a piece of land in Kampala Uganda and built an orphanage which is occupied by Blessed Hill Children Centre. The charity provides continuing monthly support to the orphanage.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 October 2023
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Accommodation/housing
- Religious Activities
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Other Charitable Activities
- Uganda
Governance
- 21 May 2007: Standard registration
No other names
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Paul Darren Harrison | Trustee | 01 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
EDWARD ALAN DOCKER | Trustee | 28 October 2021 |
|
|||||
Lorraine Maxine Williamson | Trustee | 18 December 2018 |
|
|
||||
ANDREW RICHARD WILLIAMSON | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/10/2019 | 31/10/2020 | 31/10/2021 | 31/10/2022 | 31/10/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £69.98k | £85.44k | £30.59k | £116.12k | £88.39k | |
|
Total expenditure | £44.91k | £50.54k | £45.11k | £64.71k | £17.10k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 October 2023 | 30 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2023 | 30 July 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2022 | 28 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2022 | 28 July 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2021 | 25 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2021 | 25 July 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2020 | 01 September 2021 | 1 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2020 | 01 September 2021 | 1 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2019 | 26 August 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2019 | 26 August 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED ON 12 OCTOBER 2006
Charitable objects
(A) TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN FAITH FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE GOSPEL OF JESUS CHRIST; (B) THE RELIEF OF FINANCIAL HARDSHIP, EITHER GENERALLY OR INDIVIDUALLY OF PEOPLE LIVING THROUGHOUT THE WORLD THROUGH THE PROVISION OF GRANTS, GOODS OR SERVICES; (C) THE RELIEF OF SICKNESS AND THE PRESERVATION OF HEALTH EITHER GENERALLY OR INDIVIDUALLY OF PEOPLE LIVING THROUGHOUT THE WORLD; (D) TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF MEMBERS OF THE PUBLIC LIVING THROUGHOUT THE WORLD; (E) THE PROVISION OF ACCOMMODATION, OR ASSISTANCE IN SUCH PROVISION, FOR THE HOMELESS, ORPHANS AND WIDOWS IN SUCH PLACES AS MAY SEEM APPROPRIATE FROM TIME TO TIME; AND (F) THE FULFILLING OF SUCH OTHER PURPOSES AS MAY FROM TIME TO TIME BE RECOGNISED BY ENGLISH LAW AS BEING CHARITABLE AND WHICH THE CHARITY SHALL FROM TIME TO TIME DETERMINE.
Area of benefit
NATIONAL AND OVERSEAS
Contact information
- Address:
-
Aughton Ainsworth
2 Merchants Quay
Salford Quays
Manchester
M50 3XR
- Phone:
- 01618778555
- Email:
- info@aughtonainsworth.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window