BEDFORD MESSIAH CHOIR

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Public Education 1 Engaging a professional conductor 2 Engaging professional vocal and instrumental soloists. 3 Promoting an annual performance of Handel's Messiah. Furtherance of Charitable Purposes 1 Nominating a local charity to receive net proceeds of performance. 2 Offering additional publicity to chosen charity. 3 Providing facilities for charity to showcase its activities.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Bedford
- Central Bedfordshire
Governance
- 17 January 2007: Standard registration
- 09 May 2010: Removed (Does not operate)
- 21 May 2010: Standard registration
- BMC (Working name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
SIAN WOODFINE | Chair | 22 November 2015 |
|
|||||
Dr Richard Gallivan | Trustee | 26 November 2012 |
|
|||||
ROLAND PAUL CARPENTER | Trustee | 17 January 2012 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2020 | 30/06/2021 | 30/06/2022 | 30/06/2023 | 30/06/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £5.70k | £1 | £9.33k | £6.09k | £6.28k | |
|
Total expenditure | £5.40k | £86 | £9.70k | £5.57k | £5.69k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | 09 May 2025 | 9 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | 03 September 2024 | 126 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | 30 April 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | 28 April 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2020 | 26 March 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 22/10/2006 AS AMENDED ON 18/11/2012
Charitable objects
1) TO ADVANCE, IMPROVE, DEVELOP AND MAINTAIN PUBLIC EDUCATION IN, AND APPRECIATION OF, THE ART AND SCIENCE OF MUSIC IN ALL ITS ASPECTS BY ANY MEANS THE TRUSTEES SEE FIT, INCLUDING THROUGH THE PRESENTATION OF PUBLIC CONCERTS AND RECITALS; 2) TO FURTHER SUCH CHARITABLE PURPOSE OR PURPOSES AS THE TRUSTEES IN THEIR ABSOLUTE DISCRETION SHALL THINK FIT BUT IN PARTICULAR THROUGH THE MAKING OF GRANTS AND DONATIONS.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED IN PRACTICE BEDFORDSHIRE
Contact information
- Address:
-
7 COXS CLOSE
SHARNBROOK
BEDFORD
MK44 1JU
- Phone:
- 01234781551
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window