Lishi Leeds

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
THE PROMOTION AND DELIVERY OF COMMUNITY CLASSES AND COURSES IN THE LEEDS AND SURROUNDING AREAS USING QUALIFIED TEACHERS OF LISHI QUANFA (CHINESE EXERCISE SYSTEM). SEEKING GRANTS AND FUNDS TO SUPPLEMENT DONATIONS RECEIVED FROM PARTICIPANTS IN ORDER TO PROVIDE A SAFE, QUALITY LEARNING ENVIRONMENT FOR EFFECTIVE PRACTICE.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Economic/community Development/employment
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Leeds City
Governance
- 20 February 2007: Standard registration
- HEADINGLEY LISHI ARTS (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Wilhelm Wetterhoff | Trustee | 01 February 2022 |
|
|
||||
BENEDICT MORLEY | Trustee | 04 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
BRIAN PRENDERGAST | Trustee | 22 June 2012 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2020 | 31/07/2021 | 31/07/2022 | 31/07/2023 | 31/07/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £14.69k | £9.62k | £6.28k | £15.32k | £4.93k | |
|
Total expenditure | £13.65k | £5.65k | £7.96k | £8.38k | £12.65k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2024 | 25 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2023 | 11 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2022 | 16 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2021 | 24 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2020 | 26 April 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 13 NOVEMBER 2006 as amended on 06 Jun 2018
Charitable objects
THE PROMOTION OF HEALTH THROUGH EDUCATION IN THE RECREATIONAL PHYSICAL ACTIVITY PROGRAMMES OF 'WEIHAI LISHI QUANFA' TO BENEFIT THE COMMUNITY OF HEADINGLEY IN LEEDS.
Area of benefit
HEADINGLEY IN LEEDS
Contact information
- Address:
-
21 Aberdeen Grove
Leeds
LS123QY
ARMLEY
- Phone:
- 01133683094
- Email:
- leeds@lishi.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window