SOUTH HERTS AND EDGWARE MASORTI

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Charity is a synagogue for the local Jewish Masorti Congregation
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 29 December 2023
People

11 Trustee(s)
4 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Religious Activities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Hertfordshire
- Throughout London
Governance
- 18 January 2007: Standard registration
- 24 January 2013: Funds received from 291010 EDGWARE MASORTI SYNAGOGUE
- THE EDGWARE MASORTI SYNAGOGUE (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
DAVID BRIAN GROSSMAN | Chair | 31 October 2012 |
|
|
||||
Jay Dor | Trustee | 29 October 2024 |
|
|||||
Jonathan Kaye | Trustee | 29 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Geoffrey Green | Trustee | 24 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Deborah Eleanor Levy | Trustee | 20 December 2021 |
|
|
||||
Oliver Joseph Davis | Trustee | 20 December 2021 |
|
|
||||
Lauren Michelle Cohen | Trustee | 20 December 2021 |
|
|
||||
Steven Marc Lux | Trustee | 20 December 2021 |
|
|
||||
Daniel Roger Davis | Trustee | 15 December 2020 |
|
|
||||
Jennifer Zetter | Trustee | 30 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Stephen Fidler | Trustee | 23 October 2013 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 29/12/2021 | 29/12/2022 | 29/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £207.25k | £190.98k | £233.57k | £238.08k | £223.75k | |
|
Total expenditure | £163.08k | £160.72k | £259.77k | £304.15k | £212.93k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 29 December 2023 | 16 December 2024 | 48 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 29 December 2023 | 16 December 2024 | 48 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 29 December 2022 | 19 June 2024 | 234 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 29 December 2022 | 19 June 2024 | 234 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 29 December 2021 | 19 June 2024 | 599 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 29 December 2021 | 19 June 2024 | 599 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 17 August 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 17 August 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 03 March 2021 | 123 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 03 March 2021 | 123 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 5 DECEMBER 2006 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 02 DEC 2013 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 08 JAN 2018 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 03 FEB 2021 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 04 OCT 2021 AS REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 18 MAR 2022 as amended on 04 Oct 2021
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE AND PROMOTE THE PRACTICE AND TEACHING OF TRADITIONAL JUDAISM IN THE TRADITION OF THE JEWISH RELIGIOUS CONSERVATIVE MOVEMENT OF THE UNITED STATES OF AMERICA AND ISRAEL 3.2 THE ORIGINAL UNINCORPORATED LEGAL ORGANISATION TO WHICH THE SYNAGOGUE IS THE SUCCESSOR WAS ESTABLISHED IN 1984 TO CREATE AN INDEPENDENT CONGREGATION FOR THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE OBJECTS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
South Herts & Edgware Masorti
Stream Lane
Edgware
HA8 7YA
- Phone:
- 02089054096
- Email:
- office@shemacommunity.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window