Accounts and annual returns HIMALAYAN EDUCATION LIFELINE PROGRAMME LIMITED

Charity Number: 1117646
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 07 December 2024 37 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2022 01 July 2024 244 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2021 17 May 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2021 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2020 13 May 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2020 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2019 12 August 2020 13 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2019 Not Required