HIMALAYAN EDUCATION LIFELINE PROGRAMME LIMITED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Himalayan Education Lifeline Programme channels financial and human resources to schools in the Himalayan region. It does this by raising money to enable schools to purchase educational equipment and books, and the construction of new buildings, and by finding people to sponsor poor children through their schooling. It also sends volunteer teachers to these schools.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Human Resources
- India
- Nepal
Governance
- 22 January 2007: Standard registration
No other names
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Simon Nicholas Forwood | Chair | 22 December 2022 |
|
|
||||
Benjamin Tenzing Coleman | Trustee | 29 December 2014 |
|
|
||||
BARBARA PORTER | Trustee | 13 January 2012 |
|
|
||||
JAMES HUNTER COLEMAN | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2019 | 30/09/2020 | 30/09/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £14.08k | £10.53k | £21.20k | £9.90k | £8.24k | |
|
Total expenditure | £14.68k | £13.28k | £18.09k | £13.62k | £3.04k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 07 December 2024 | 37 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 01 July 2024 | 244 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | 17 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | 13 May 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2019 | 12 August 2020 | 13 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 27 MAY 2003 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 7 SEPTEMBER 2003
Charitable objects
A) TO PROMOTE (WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF SEX, SEXUAL ORIENTATION, RACE OR POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS) ANY CHARITABLE PURPOSE THAT THE DIRECTORS MAY FROM TIME TO TIME SEE FIT AND WITHOUT PREJUDICE TO THE GENERALITY OF THE FOREGOING, IN PARTICULAR. I) TO INCREASE AND IMPROVE THE PROVISION OF EDUCATION AND VOCATIONAL TRAINING AND HEALTH SERVICES FOR THE BENEFIT OF POOR COMMUNITIES. II) TO PROMOTE AND OR IMPROVE THE USE OF EDUCATIONAL TRAINING AND HEALTH SERVICES. III) TO ASSIST THE RELIEF OF POVERTY IN THE HIMALAYAS, THE SURROUNDING REGIONS AND OTHER SUCH PARTS OF THE WORLD AS THE DIRECTORS MAY FROM TIME TO TIME THINK FIT. IV) TO PROMOTE, ASSIST OR IMPROVE THE SETTING UP AND RUNNING OF BUSINESS ENTERPRISES IN THE HIMALAYAS THE SURROUNDING REGIONS AND OTHER PARTS OF THE WORLD AS THE DIRECTORS MAY FROM TIME TO TIME THINK FIT.
Area of benefit
THE HIMALAYAS AND SURROUNDING REGIONS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
100 High Street
WHITSTABLE
CT5 1AT
- Phone:
- +61 424458380
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window