LLANGYNWYD RANGERS BOYS' AND GIRLS' CLUB OF WALES FOOTBALL CLUB
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Sport / Recreation
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 May 2019
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- Other Charitable Activities
- Bridgend
Governance
- 26 March 2007: Standard registration
- 06 July 2021: Removed (Funds transferred (incor))
- 06 July 2021: Funds transferred to 1191676 LLANGYNWYD RANGERS BOYS AND GIRLS CLUB
- LLANGYNWYD RANGERS MINI & JUNIOR FOOTBALL CLUB (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/05/2015 | 31/05/2016 | 31/05/2017 | 31/05/2018 | 31/05/2019 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £68.28k | £32.70k | £65.40k | £30.32k | £32.73k | |
|
Total expenditure | £68.11k | £25.60k | £51.21k | £32.49k | £19.23k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £1.50k | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 May 2021 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2021 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 May 2020 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2020 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 May 2019 | 13 August 2020 | 135 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2019 | 13 August 2020 | 135 days late | |
Annual return | 31 May 2018 | 28 January 2020 | 303 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2018 | 28 January 2020 | 303 days late |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 08/10/2006 AS AMENDED ON 24/07/2014
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF YOUNG PEOPLE BETWEEN THE AGES OF 6 AND 16 BY PROVIDING OPPORTUNITIES AND FACILITIES FOR PLAYING SOCCER AND OTHER GAMES AND SPORTS SO AS TO DEVELOP THEIR PHYSICAL, MENTAL CAPACITIES. THAT THEY MAY GROW TO FULL MATURITY AS INDIVIDUALS AND MEMBERS OF SOCIETY AND THAT THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE MAY BE IMPROVED.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window