Financial history ST EDMUNDS COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION LTD

Charity Number: 1118103
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023 31/08/2024
Total gross income £21.39k £30.95k £33.97k £33.06k £34.46k
Total expenditure £21.47k £19.62k £31.45k £28.99k £37.50k
Income from government contracts £5.70k N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £20.38k £8.31k N/A N/A