SLOUGH SOCIETY FOR MENTALLY HANDICAPPED CHLDREN AND ADULTS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Slough Mencap runs an evening social clubs for our members with Learning Disabilities. We also run daytime activities 2 days a week. The evening club is responsible for enhancing the confidence and social skills of our members as well as reducing isolation. In addition we run various parties and outings for our members. We offer free advice to our members on all sorts of issues.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2024
People

8 Trustee(s)
20 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Disability
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Slough
Governance
- 23 March 2009: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Jane Cable | Chair | 01 June 2020 |
|
|
||||
Jean Sharman-Golder | Trustee | 23 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Leonard William Jones | Trustee | 10 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Surinder Singh Suri | Trustee | 10 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
James Robb | Trustee | 01 June 2020 |
|
|
||||
Sajidhah Chaudhary | Trustee | 15 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Carmel O'Brien | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MARY BERNARDETTE BATES | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2020 | 30/09/2021 | 30/09/2022 | 30/09/2023 | 30/09/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £271.47k | £22.57k | £97.66k | £165.81k | £144.28k | |
|
Total expenditure | £77.66k | £59.30k | £71.36k | £89.62k | £172.90k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2024 | 21 February 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2024 | Accounts not yet received | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | 25 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | 25 June 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | 06 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | 06 May 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | 18 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | 03 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | 03 June 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 18 SEPTEMBER 2006
Charitable objects
(I) THE RELIEF OF PEOPLE WITH A LEARNING DISABILITY IN PARTICULAR BY THE PROVISION OF HELP AND SUPPORT FOR THEM AND FOR THEIR FAMILIES, DEPENDANTS AND CARERS, AND TO PREVENT LEARNING DISABILITIES FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT (II) TO PROVIDE OR ASSIST IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR THE RECREATION OR OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION FOR PEOPLE WHO HAVE NEED THEREOF BY REASON OF LEARNING DISABILITY WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, LOCAL.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Slough Mencap
Horsemoor Green Community Centre
Common Road
SLOUGH
SL3 8JU
- Phone:
- 01753594666
- Email:
- sloughmencap52@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window