FRIENDS AND ASSOCIATES OF BILLINGBOROUGH PRIMARY SCHOOL
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Raising money for Billingborough Primary School through various activities such as school discos, raffles and tombolas.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2014
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Other Charitable Activities
- Lincolnshire
Governance
- 23 March 2007: Standard registration
- 09 February 2017: Removed (Does not operate)
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2009 | 31/08/2010 | 31/08/2011 | 31/08/2012 | 31/08/2014 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £2.98k | £1.99k | £1.85k | £2.49k | £1.77k | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.87k | £1.46k | £3.13k | £1.78k | £3.90k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2016 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2016 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2015 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2015 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2014 | 24 September 2014 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2014 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2013 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2013 | Not submitted |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 29 NOVEMBER 2006
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF PUPILS IN THE SCHOOL IN PARTICULAR BY 1. DEVELOPING EFFECTIVE RELATIONSHIPS BETWEEN THE STAFF, PARENTS AND OTHERS ASSOCIATED WITH THE SCHOOL; 2. ENGAGING IN ACTIVITIES OR PROVIDING FACILITIES OR EQUIPMENT WHICH SUPPORT THE SCHOOL AND ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUPILS.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED IN PRACTICE LINCOLNSHIRE
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window