BHOLA'S CHILDREN

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We fund a home and school for orphaned and disabled children on the island of Bhola in Bangladesh. Capacity is now over 50 live-in children plus 20 attending daily. We arrange medical ops and assistive devices for the disabled, teach the 3R's and life skills, and train in farming, tailoring, carpentry and metalwork. We educate the local community on avoidable causes of disability.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

8 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- Accommodation/housing
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Bangladesh
Governance
- 12 March 2007: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
DINAH LEAH CARLOTTA WIENER | Chair | 19 February 2007 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Hogan | Trustee | 10 July 2018 |
|
|
||||
Freda Mary Graf | Trustee | 21 January 2014 |
|
|
||||
Nick Breeze | Trustee | 26 June 2013 |
|
|
||||
MS ANNE HAMILTON | Trustee | 29 April 2008 |
|
|
||||
MR SANDY ANSON | Trustee | 20 April 2007 |
|
|
||||
BARNABY MARK WIENER | Trustee | 19 February 2007 |
|
|
||||
BRUNA MARIA COLOMBO-OTTEN | Trustee | 19 February 2007 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £218.40k | £35.69k | £41.66k | £43.99k | £38.03k | |
|
Total expenditure | £96.25k | £56.16k | £141.42k | £141.42k | £106.82k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 14 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 14 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 19 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 19 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 31 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 31 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 26 August 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 26 August 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 16 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 16 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 19 FEBRUARY 2007
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION AND THE PRESERVATION AND PROTECTION OF HEALTH AND THE RELIEF OF FINANCIAL HARDSHIP AMONG CHILDREN IN SOUTHERN BANGLADESH PARTICULARLY THOSE ORPHANED AND/OR WITH PHYSICAL DISABILITIES, BY SUCH MEANS AS THE TRUSTEES IN THEIR ABSOLUTE DISCRETION SEE FIT.
Area of benefit
SOUTHERN BANGLADESH
Contact information
- Address:
-
12 CORNWALL GROVE
LONDON
W4 2LB
- Phone:
- 02089946011
- Email:
- mail@bholaschildren.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window