Financial history JACK AND JILL WINDMILLS SOCIETY

Charity number: 1118285
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £8.05k £12.37k £12.93k £8.18k £9.31k
Total expenditure £4.71k £2.49k £6.12k £7.48k £4.02k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £10.00k £8.00k N/A N/A