Financial history KAIROS EUROPE

Charity Number: 1119005
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2011 31/03/2012 31/03/2013 31/03/2014 31/03/2015
Total gross income £2.99k £6.68k £292 £1.83k £540
Total expenditure £6.43k £5.21k £80 £3.02k £28
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A