YOUTHCOMPASS EUROPE (UK)
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
YouthCompass Europe (UK) was established in 2006 to support the international activities of YouthCompass Europe. In particular, the company will seek to raise funding in the UK and to source ministry workers.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2022
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Provides Services
- Germany
- Northern Ireland
- Scotland
Governance
- 06 February 2008: Standard registration
- 27 November 2024: Removed (Ceased to exist)
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2018 | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 189 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 189 days | |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 29 September 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 15 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 27 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 28 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 13 NOVEMBER 2006 AS AMENDED 1 FEBRUARY 2007
Charitable objects
1) TO PROMOTE FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT THE SOCIAL PHYSICAL INTELLECTUAL AND SPIRITUAL DEVELOPMENT OF ADOLESCENTS OF ALL NATIONALITIES THROUGH RECREATIONAL AND OTHER LEISURE-TIME ACTIVITIES PARTICULARLY AMONGST YOUNG PEOPLE IN EDUCATIONAL ESTABLISHMENTS TO IMPROVE THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE AND TO UNDERTAKE THIS OBJECT IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE STATEMENT OF BELIEFS APPEARING IN THE SCHEDULE HERETO IN SUCH PARTS OF THE UNITED KINGDOM OR THE WORLD AS THE DIRECTORS OF THE CHARITY (HEREIN CALLED "THE TRUSTEES") MAY FROM TIME TO TIME THINK FIT. 2 TO FURTHER SUCH OTHER PURPOSES THAT ARE EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE ACCORDING TO THE LAW OF ENGLAND AND WALES AND ARE CONNECTED WITH THE WORK OF THE CHARITY AS EXPRESSED ABOVE.
Area of benefit
UNITED KINGDOM OR THE WORLD
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window