AFRICAT UK

Charity number: 1120026
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

The conservation and preservation of fauna in Africa in particular by funding and supporting the development and implementation of programmes to conserve and protect the large carnivores of Namibia. To advance education in the conservation, protection, and improvement of the physical and natural environment.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Total income: £14,504
Total expenditure: £3,792

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Animals
  • Environment/conservation/heritage
Who the charity helps:
  • Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
Where the charity operates:
  • City Of London

Governance

Registration history:
  • 11 July 2007: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Charitable company
Other names:
  • AFRICAT UK LIMITED (Previous name)
  • AFRICKAT UK LIMITED (Previous name)
Company number:
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Conflicting interests
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

3 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
charlotte anne shipton Trustee 01 September 2024
None on record
Janet Widdows Trustee 20 May 2024
None on record
Francis James Horan Trustee 20 September 2023
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £51.83k £37.16k £17.23k £13.60k £14.50k
Total expenditure £73.47k £104.12k £38.71k £18.67k £3.79k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 12 October 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2022 31 October 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2021 28 October 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2020 31 October 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 31 October 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 17 October 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 17 October 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
5 BRACKENDALE WAY
READING
RG6 1DZ
Phone:
01189351681
Email:
No information available