Trustees YOUNG ADVISORS COMPANY LTD
Charity Number: 1121476

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Thomas William Smith | Trustee | 05 December 2023 |
|
|
||||
Aimee Louise Hadwin | Trustee | 05 December 2023 |
|
|
||||
Elle Joan Thomson Lappin | Trustee | 05 December 2023 |
|
|
||||
Shannon Bryan | Trustee | 17 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Ida Saidy | Trustee | 10 June 2020 |
|
|
||||
Faith Catherine Beatrice Agba-Butler | Trustee | 10 June 2020 |
|
|
||||
Ben Broadhurst | Trustee | 28 August 2018 |
|
|
||||
Lucy Skelhorn | Trustee | 28 August 2018 |
|
|
||||
Oliver Andrew Dyson | Trustee | 10 December 2016 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.