SUSTAINABILITY PARTNERS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Support to individuals and self help groups working to improve their livelihoods and protect the environment.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Indonesia
- Nicaragua
Governance
- 22 May 2007: Standard registration
No other names
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MAGGIE-JO STJOHN | Trustee | 28 May 2013 |
|
|
||||
RONALD HENRY JAMES HOPWOOD | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
AMY HOPWOOD | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
CORALIE ROSE HOPWOOD | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £33.16k | £30.49k | £33.34k | £29.76k | £18.75k | |
|
Total expenditure | £32.05k | £30.53k | £27.91k | £23.89k | £19.03k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 24 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 09 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 09 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 07 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 07 September 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 30 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 30 September 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 06 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 06 September 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 15 FEBRUARY 2007
Charitable objects
1. TO DEVELOP THE CAPACITY AND SKILLS OF THE MEMBERS OF SOCIALLY AND ECONOMICALLY DISADVANTAGED COMMUNITIES IN SUCH A WAY THAT THEY ARE BETTER ABLE TO IDENTIFY AND HELP MEET THEIR NEEDS AND TO PARTICIPATE MORE FULLY IN SOCIETY, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY SUPPORTING THE DEVELOPMENT OF SELF HELP ASSOCIATIONS. 2. TO RELIEVE FINANCIAL HARDSHIP, EITHER GENERALLY OR INDIVIDUALLY, THROUGH THE PROVISION OF GRANTS, GOODS OR SERVICES. 3. TO PROMOTE THE PROTECTION AND SUSTAINABLE USE OF THE NATURAL ENVIRONMENT FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC, THROUGH EDUCATION, TRAINING AND DEMONSTRATION PROJECTS.
Area of benefit
NATIONAL AND OVERSEAS
Contact information
- Address:
-
18 WOODLANDS CLOSE
DIBDEN PURLIEU
SOUTHAMPTON
SO45 4JG
- Phone:
- 02380845901
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window