COMPASS LEARNING CENTRE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
CLC ACADEMY-This is a project which delivers Islamic and other educational provisions by employing a fusion of modern and traditional teaching techniques. HIFZ PROGRAMME-A well structured Hifz (memorization of the Quran). ISLAMIC SCIENCES COURSE FOR MALES/FEMALES-These are full-part-time courses for adults which delivers a wide range of courses on Islam.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
15 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Religious Activities
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Lancashire
Governance
- 23 March 2007: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Fuad Ahmed | Chair | 02 January 2017 |
|
|||||
MUHAMMAD AKMAL HUSSAIN | Trustee | 22 February 2012 |
|
|
||||
MOHAMMED AFZAL ALI | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2020 | 30/06/2021 | 30/06/2022 | 30/06/2023 | 30/06/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £152.09k | £157.86k | £153.00k | £198.69k | £228.13k | |
|
Total expenditure | £101.51k | £109.39k | £123.85k | £136.44k | £182.00k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £51.65k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | 23 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | 23 April 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | 28 May 2024 | 28 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | 28 May 2024 | 28 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | 24 May 2023 | 24 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | 24 May 2023 | 24 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | 27 April 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | 27 April 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2020 | 03 April 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR |
30 June 2020
(These accounts |
03 April 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 10 DECEMBER 2006.
Charitable objects
1) TO ADVANCE ISLAMIC EDUCATION. 2) TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN THE NATIONAL CURRICULUM SUBJECTS. 3) THE RELIEF OF PEOPLE SUFFERING FROM DRUGS AND ALCOHOL ABUSE. 4) THE PROMOTION OF RELIGIOUS HARMONY FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC BY: A) EDUCATING THE PUBLIC IN DIFFERENT RELIGIOUS BELIEFS INCLUDING AN AWARENESS OF THEIR DISTINCTIVE FEATURES AND THEIR COMMON GROUNDS TO PROMOTE GOOD RELATIONS BETWEEN PERSONS OF DIFFERENT FAITHS.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED IN PRACTICE OLDHAM, LANCASHIRE
Contact information
- Address:
-
Compass Learning
Partington House
Stock Lane
Chadderton
OLDHAM
OL9 9EY
- Phone:
- 01616525655
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window