FRIENDS OF STAR OF HOPE (BULGARIA)
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Working with children in orphanages, adults in institutions, running a halfway house for young people leaving institutions to enable them to integrate into society, funding and arranging medical treatments for orphans and other children in deprived circumstances.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2019
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Other Finance
- Other Charitable Activities
- Bulgaria
Governance
- 16 March 2007: Standard registration
- 11 January 2020: Removed (Ceased to exist)
No other names
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2015 | 05/04/2016 | 05/04/2017 | 05/04/2018 | 05/04/2019 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £3.04k | £1.53k | £1.84k | £728 | £198 | |
|
Total expenditure | £2.08k | £2.63k | £1.53k | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2019 | 30 December 2019 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2019 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2018 | 30 December 2019 | 328 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2018 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2017 | 20 January 2018 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2017 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2016 | 20 January 2018 | 349 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2016 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 18 JANUARY 2007.
Charitable objects
I) TO RELIEVE THE NEEDS OF ABANDONED CHILDREN, ORPHANS AND ADULTS WITH PHYSICAL AND/OR MENTAL DISABILITIES AND FAMILIES LIVING IN EXTREME POVERTY WITHIN BULGARIA. II) TO ADVANCE EDUCATION AND RELIEVE NEED FOR PEOPLE LEAVING INSTITUTIONAL CARE IN BULGARIA WITH A VIEW TO PROMOTING THEIR PARTICIPATION IN SOCIETY. III) TO PROVIDE OR ASSIST IN THE PROVISION OF RECREATION OR OTHER LEISURE-TIME OCCUPATION FOR CHILDREN AND ADULTS IN NEED IN BULGARIA IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE AND WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE. IV) TO RELIEVE POVERTY AND MEET THE NEEDS OF SUPPORT WORKERS WORKING TO ACHIEVE THE ABOVE OBJECTS.
Area of benefit
BULGARIA.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window