1ST COVENTRY (ALLESLEY VILLAGE) SCOUT GROUP

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We provide Scouting for:- Beaver Scouts ages 6-8 Cub Scouts ages 8-10.5 Air Scouts ages 10.5-14 All groups are mixed gender. We are based in Allesley Village Coventry and have our own Scout H.Q. We are trying to raise funds to improve the building and equipment used by our scouts.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

7 Trustee(s)
24 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Amateur Sport
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Children/young People
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Coventry City
Governance
- 19 April 2007: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Louisa Hill | Trustee | 14 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Clive Adrian Leftwich | Trustee | 09 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Anthony Ryan | Trustee | 01 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
David Faries | Trustee | 01 April 2014 |
|
|
||||
ANDY JONES | Trustee | 01 January 2013 |
|
|
||||
TRACY GRIFFITHS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
TREVOR GRIFFITHS | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £35.66k | £24.24k | £40.57k | £32.98k | £37.19k | |
|
Total expenditure | £21.60k | £9.31k | £29.18k | £25.47k | £33.74k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £22.67k | £11.02k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 11 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 11 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 27 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 27 November 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 03 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 03 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 27 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 26 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 26 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
ROYAL CHARTER GRANTED 04/01/1912
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE THE DEVELOPMENT OF YOUNG PEOPLE IN ACHIEVING THEIR FULL, PHYSICAL, INTELLECTUAL, SOCIAL AND SPIRITUAL POTENTIAL AS INDIVIDUALS, AS RESPONSIBLE CITIZENS AND AS MEMBERS OF THEIR LOCAL, NATIONAL AND INTERNATIONAL COMMUNITIES.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED. IN PRACTICE ALLESLEY, COVENTRY, WEST MIDLANDS
Contact information
- Address:
-
1 Scafell Close
COVENTRY
CV5 7JH
- Phone:
- 07711814874
- Website:
-
1stcoventryscouts.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window