UGANDA LEARN4LIFE
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
All objectives of the charity have been achieved and therefore the charity has been closed with effect from 1st Dec 2015 Many thanks to all those organisations and individuals for the tremendous support over the last 10 years.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2015
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Cheshire East
- Uganda
Governance
- 03 April 2007: Standard registration
- 15 December 2015: Removed (Ceased to exist)
- ST JOHNS AND ST STEPHENS CHURCH FELLOWSHIP (Working name)
- UL4L (Working name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2011 | 05/04/2012 | 05/04/2013 | 05/04/2014 | 05/04/2015 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £16.72k | £17.96k | £19.48k | £12.87k | £22.06k | |
|
Total expenditure | £15.75k | £18.31k | £11.64k | £15.17k | £24.44k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2015 | 01 July 2015 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2015 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2014 | 16 July 2014 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2014 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2013 | 30 July 2013 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2013 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2012 | 08 October 2012 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2012 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 1 DECEMBER 2006
Charitable objects
TO FUND SECONDARY SCHOOL PUPIL EDUCATION IN THE LUWERO DISTRICT OF UGANDA BY DIRECTLY PAYING FOR NON-STATE FUNDED PLACES, FUNDING SCHOOL MAINTENANCE PROGRAMMES, AS WELL AS, FINANCING SCHOOL PROJECTS, WHERE PROJECTS ARE CAPITAL EXPENDITURE FOCUSED ON SCHOOL INFRASTRUCTURE OR SCHOOL EQUIPMENT.
Area of benefit
UGANDA
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window