THE HOLFORDS OF WESTONBIRT TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To protect and preserve for the benefit of the public and the nation Westonbirt House and Gardens and the Estates previously in the ownership of the Holford family in the county of Gloucestershire and the Holford Heritage associated therewith.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2024
People

9 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Gloucestershire
Governance
- 14 May 2008: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
The Hon Lady Sophie Scruton | Chair | 01 July 2019 |
|
|
||||
Belinda Bradley | Trustee | 23 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Ross Sharpe | Trustee | 10 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Angela Potter | Trustee | 27 June 2019 |
|
|
||||
Charles Ralph | Trustee | 27 February 2018 |
|
|
||||
MARCUS GALEA | Trustee | 17 June 2013 |
|
|
||||
NATASHA DANGERFIELD | Trustee | 04 February 2013 |
|
|
||||
ANNABELLA SCOTT BA | Trustee | 23 May 2011 |
|
|
||||
SIMON TOMLINSON | Trustee | 23 May 2011 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | 31/08/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £130.38k | £53.58k | £290.24k | £33.53k | £31.35k | |
|
Total expenditure | £259.70k | £221.33k | £69.55k | £93.27k | £85.96k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £90.00k | £20.20k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2024 | 28 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2024 | 28 April 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 21 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 21 May 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 17 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR |
31 August 2022
(These accounts |
17 May 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 31 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 11 April 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 24 May 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 24 May 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 21 DECEMBER 2006 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 19 JUL 2019
Charitable objects
TO PROTECT AND PRESERVE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC AND OF THE NATION WESTONBIRT HOUSE AND GARDENS AND ESTATES PREVIOUSLY IN THE OWNERSHIP OF THE HOLFORD FAMILY IN THE COUNTY OF GLOUCESTER AND THE HOLFORD HERITAGE ASSOCIATED THEREWITH.
Area of benefit
LOCAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
WESTONBIRT SCHOOL
WESTONBIRT
TETBURY
GL8 8QG
- Phone:
- 01666881357
- Email:
- admin@holfordtrust.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window