Financial history BODIES IN MOTION (PENDLE) LTD

Charity number: 1119711
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £54.80k £93.22k £96.52k £123.44k £272.00k
Total expenditure £33.21k £64.69k £71.77k £71.63k £91.00k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A £85.70k N/A £201.00k