BWLCHYSARNAU COMMUNITY CENTRE COMMITTEE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To promote for the benefit of the inhabitants of Bwlchysarnau & the surrounding area, the provision of facilities for recreation or other leisure occupation of individuals who have need of such facilities by reason of their youth, age,infirmity or diablement, financial hardship or social or economic circumstances or for the public at large in the interests of social welfare.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 15 November 2023
People

8 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Powys
Governance
- 02 February 2007: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Bronwen Watkins | Trustee | 17 January 2019 |
|
|
||||
Lucy McKeown | Trustee | 22 September 2016 |
|
|
||||
Edina Lacey | Trustee | 22 September 2016 |
|
|
||||
RHYDIAN DAVIES | Trustee | 21 November 2012 |
|
|
||||
JOAN ELIZABETH PRICE LEWIS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
VALERIE MEDINA DAVIES | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Gwen Watkins | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
EVELYN EDWARD DAVID DAVIES | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 15/11/2019 | 15/11/2020 | 15/11/2021 | 15/11/2022 | 15/11/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £10.36k | £10.59k | £890 | £1.40k | £1.72k | |
|
Total expenditure | £8.46k | £4.07k | £7.32k | £1.67k | £2.56k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £250 | £10.25k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 15 November 2023 | 03 December 2024 | 79 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 15 November 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 15 November 2022 | 28 September 2023 | 13 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 15 November 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 15 November 2021 | 14 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 15 November 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 15 November 2020 | 31 August 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 15 November 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 15 November 2019 | 24 January 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 15 November 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 16 NOVEMBER 2006
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF BWLCHYSARNAU AND THE SURROUNDING AREA , THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR RECREATION OR OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION OF INDIVIDUALS WHO HAVE NEED OF SUCH FACILITIES BY REASON OF THEIR YOUTH, AGE, INFIRMITY OR DISABLEMENT, FINANCIAL HARDSHIP OR SOCIAL OR ECONOMIC CIRCUMSTANCES OR FOR THE PUBLIC AT LARGE IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE AND WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITION OF LIFE OF THE SAID INHABITANTS
Area of benefit
BWLCHYSARNAU
Contact information
- Address:
-
Hazeldene
Bwlch-Y-Sarnau
RHAYADER
Powys
LD6 5ND
- Phone:
- 07798690425
- Email:
- edinalacey.bys@gmail.com
- Website:
-
bwlchysarnau.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window