MANSFIELD BOWLING CLUB

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Bowling Club is financed from Members funding.We offer help and opportunity to young and disabled people to persue this sporting activity.We raised funds to provide our clubhouse and green.The non profit making club is funded by subscriptions,raffles, events etc. Our new clubhouse is available for public letting and enhances our activities with off season indoor bowls and social evenings.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

14 Trustee(s)
17 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Derbyshire
- Nottinghamshire
Governance
- 31 January 2007: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
14 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Christine Bagnall | Trustee | 24 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Cheryl Crowe | Trustee | 24 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Michael Cooper | Trustee | 24 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Christopher Walker | Trustee | 24 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Janet Parkin | Trustee | 24 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Catherine Heslop | Trustee | 18 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Malc Fokes | Trustee | 18 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Jane Hurst | Trustee | 20 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Richard Czubkowski | Trustee | 20 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Paul Sanderson | Trustee | 22 March 2021 |
|
|
||||
Dawn Wood | Trustee | 22 March 2021 |
|
|
||||
HAZEL SOUTHERINGTON | Trustee | 24 March 2014 |
|
|
||||
JOHN STUART HALLOWS | Trustee | 25 March 2013 |
|
|
||||
ELEANOR MARGARET LAKE | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £22.10k | £23.60k | £21.27k | £23.92k | £29.47k | |
|
Total expenditure | £18.82k | £19.01k | £13.67k | £20.58k | £26.27k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £12.50k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 20 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 20 May 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 11 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 25 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 04 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 07 August 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM OF ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 19 SEPTEMBER 2006
Charitable objects
TO PROVIDE A BOWLS CLUB IN MANSFIELD, NOTTINGHAMSHIRE, IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE AND FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC. THE CLUB IS PROVIDED WITH THE OBJECT OF THE IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THOSE PEOPLE IN NEED OF THE FACILITIES.
Area of benefit
NOTTINGHAMSHIRE
Contact information
- Address:
-
7 Orchid Grove
Pleasley
MANSFIELD
NG19 7FJ
- Phone:
- 01623810565
- Email:
- eleanormlake@hotmail.co.uk
- Website:
-
mansfieldbowlingclub.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window