Financial history THROUGHCARE HOUSING & SUPPORT LTD

Charity Number: 1117761
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/11/2020 30/11/2021 30/11/2022 30/11/2023 30/11/2024
Total gross income £328.96k £348.66k £401.46k £426.83k £489.45k
Total expenditure £375.24k £369.20k £377.64k £408.98k £464.80k
Income from government contracts £328.96k £348.66k £289.08k £408.06k £5
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A