Accounts and annual returns COVENANTED CHRIST UNIVERSAL CHURCH OF GOD

Charity number: 1118558
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 03 June 2024 10 May 2025 37 days late
Accounts and TAR 03 June 2024 Not Required
Annual return 03 June 2023 27 August 2024 146 days late
Accounts and TAR 03 June 2023 Not Required
Annual return 03 June 2022 10 May 2023 37 days late
Accounts and TAR 03 June 2022 Not Required
Annual return 03 June 2021 18 March 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 03 June 2021 Not Required
Annual return 03 June 2020 16 March 2022 347 days late
Accounts and TAR 03 June 2020 Not Required