Financial history GLOSSOPDALE FURNITURE PROJECT

Charity number: 1118353
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £192.72k £236.78k £229.61k £256.67k £326.06k
Total expenditure £211.86k £201.43k £236.22k £241.19k £275.64k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £32.00k £67.46k N/A £34.63k £21.53k