AEGIS-CHOICE IN CARE
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Information on the charity's activities is not available.
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Knowsley
- Liverpool City
- Sefton
- St Helens
- Wirral
Governance
- 23 March 2007: Standard registration
- 09 May 2010: Removed (Does not operate)
No other names
Financial history
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2009 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2009 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2008 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2008 | Not submitted |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 24 JUNE 1999 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 8 FEBRUARY 2007.
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE SICKNESS, PRESERVE AND PROTECT GOOD HEALTH AND RELIEVE FINANCIAL HARDSHIP AMONGST THE ELDERLY, PHYSICALLY DISABLED AND PEOPLE SUFFERING FROM MENTAL HEALTH PROBLEMS AND THEIR CARERS BY THE PROVISION OF INFORMATION RELATED TO HEALTH AND CARE PROVISION ; AND TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY THE ELDERLY, PHYSICALLY DISABLED AND PEOPLE SUFFERING FROM MENTAL HEALTH PROBLEMS, IN MATTERS RELATING TO CARE PROVISION, TREATMENT AND ACCOMMODATION.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window