Financial history TONGWYNLAIS TEMPERANCE BAND

Charity number: 1117861
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £12.34k £3.85k £11.56k £10.73k £17.95k
Total expenditure £11.47k £4.54k £7.52k £8.41k £22.18k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A