Financial history ACTS OF LOVE INTERNATIONAL

Charity number: 1119687
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £15.54k £35.70k £133.62k £46.47k £31.20k
Total expenditure £9.92k £33.20k £141.87k £45.30k £30.55k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A