WILLOW NURSERY AND PRE-SCHOOL LIMITED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We provide full day care for children aged 3 months to 4 years 11 months
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2023
Total income includes £111,095 from 3 government grant(s)
People

4 Trustee(s)
4 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Somerset
Governance
- 29 November 2007: Standard registration
- 14 January 2025: Funds received from 1033661 PARCROFT PRESCHOOLPLAYGROUP
No other names
- Ofsted (Office For Standards In Education)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Emma Dukes | Trustee | 14 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
Emma Rogers | Trustee | 05 February 2018 |
|
|
||||
Lucy Tyne | Trustee | 05 February 2018 |
|
|
||||
JEMMA PYKE | Trustee | 26 June 2013 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2019 | 30/09/2020 | 30/09/2021 | 30/09/2022 | 30/09/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £240.98k | £176.30k | £210.98k | £263.13k | £241.56k | |
|
Total expenditure | £240.63k | £192.33k | £220.01k | £171.26k | £263.73k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £132.16k | £106.91k | £117.44k | £111.10k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | 10 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | 10 June 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | 17 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | 17 July 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | 29 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | 29 July 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | 21 January 2022 | 175 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | 21 January 2022 | 175 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2019 | 31 July 2020 | 1 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2019 | 31 July 2020 | 1 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 20 SEPTEMBER 2006 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 30 MAY 2007.
Charitable objects
TO ENHANCE THE DEVELOPMENT AND EDUCATION OF CHILDREN PRIMARILY UNDER STATUTORY SCHOOL AGE BY PROVIDING AND/OR ASSISTING IN THE PROVISION OF CHILDCARE AND EDUCATIONAL SERVICES FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE COMMUNITY, IN PARTICULAR (WITHOUT LIMITATION) CHILDREN OF 0-5 YEARS SERVICES IN THE AREA OF SHEPTON MALLET.
Area of benefit
SHEPTON MALLET
Contact information
- Address:
-
Willow Nursery & Pre-School
Charlton Road
SHEPTON MALLET
BA4 5PG
- Phone:
- 01749347006
- Email:
- willowshepton@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window