Trustees THE PHOENIX TRUST (MILTON) LTD

Charity number: 1118548
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

10 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Anna-Lisa Maria Ghale Chair 17 April 2023
None on record
Elizabeth Hearmon Trustee 11 April 2025
None on record
Howard Edward Scarborough Mr Trustee 07 April 2025
None on record
Neil Trevor Cook Trustee 02 October 2024
None on record
Graham John Thomas Trustee 03 September 2024
None on record
Stephen Mark Bentley Trustee 03 September 2024
None on record
Malcolm Howting Trustee 20 September 2023
None on record
Rebecca Jane Munns Trustee 13 April 2021
None on record
Charles Hobley Trustee 21 April 2015
None on record
Norman Jones Trustee 26 June 2013
None on record